+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 1977 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Public law 95-29.
On May 6, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On May 5, 1977 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
- Cleared for White House
On May 5, 1977 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to House amendments to certain Senate amendments.
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On May 4, 1977 in the House:
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments with an amendment.
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #190 .
On May 3, 1977 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-238.
- Conference scheduled in House.
On May 2, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #130 .
On March 17, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 95-58.
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On March 15, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #76 .
- Motion to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations rejected in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On March 11, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 95-66 .
On March 10, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 95-66.
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor