+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On July 13, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
On July 12, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 414 - 0 .
On July 11, 1988 in the House:
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On July 7, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 458.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 100-757.
On June 28, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 21, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs.
On June 20, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor