+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Susan W. Brooks
Type:
Primary Sponsor