+ − Summary
+ − Actions (33)
On November 18, 1988 in the House:
- See H.R.5210 .
On July 18, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On July 12, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM, Justice, US Postal Service.
On July 8, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On July 5, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On July 1, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
On June 30, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, Commerce, State, DOD, DOT.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Investigations.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Merchant Marine.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Aviation.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Oceanography.
On June 29, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Justice.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On June 28, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
On June 16, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Intelligence .
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor