+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- See S.2526 .
On March 30, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On March 29, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 348 - 38 .
- House Agreed to Amendments Adopted by the Committee of the Whole.
- The Clerk Reported Committee Amendments.
- Called up by House by Rule.
- Rule Passed House.
On March 27, 1984 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.472 Reported to House.
- Committee on Rules Granted an Open Rule Providing One Hour of Debate; Making in Order the Amendment Recommended by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries; Waiving all Points of Order Against Said Amendment.
On March 22, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 359.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-631.
On March 14, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 6, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 23, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 21, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT.
On February 9, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor