+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On September 12, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4840 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 6, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 465.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-804 .
On July 26, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 20, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On July 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor