+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5818)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4806.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5818-5819)
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 483.
- Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-585, Part I.
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On October 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor