+ − Actions (14)
On July 27, 1982 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.6867 .
On June 22, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 3, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
- Executive Comment Received From Conmerce.
On May 26, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 17, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 14, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From State.
On February 9, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From US Intl Trade Comm.
On December 9, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From US Intl Trade Comm, US Trade Rep.
- Executive Comment Received From State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor,.
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, US Intl Trade Comm, US Trade Rep.
On October 23, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On October 21, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor