+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor