+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On December 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 17 (Roll no. 494). (text: 11/29/2022 CR H8633-8634)
On December 1, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 17 (Roll no. 494).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8695-8696)
On November 29, 2022 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4785.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8633-8637)
- Ms. Jacobs (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation.
On July 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor