+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2411-2412)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4780.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2411-2413)
- Mr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 439.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-566.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor