+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- S.Amdt.2704 Amendment SA 2704 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2704 Amendment SA 2704 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S7450-7451; text: CR S7450-7451) In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7450-7451)
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7450-7451)
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 211). (text: CR 09/29/2020 H4996)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5089-5090)
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4764.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4996-4998)
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 449.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-549.
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2704
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.2704
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor