+ − Summary
+ − Actions (23)
On October 18, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-438.
- Signed by President.
On October 9, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 5, 1990 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 4, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 4, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 851.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick without amendment. Without written report.
On September 25, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 13, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On June 12, 1990 in the House:
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Mr. Kostmayer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
On June 7, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Offshore Energy Resources.
On May 17, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On May 14, 1990 in the House:
- For Previous Action See H.R.512 .
On May 9, 1990 in the House:
- Referred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred jointly to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor