+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- Provisions Included in S.11 .
On October 19, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 18, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2011 with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2011 amended.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
On July 26, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 395 - 0 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On July 7, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 461.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 100-760.
On June 28, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 3, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor