+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 47 (Roll no. 89). (text: 3/28/2022 CR H3883-3884)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3953-3954)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 47 (Roll no. 89).(text: 3/28/2022 CR H3883-3884)
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Ms. Scanlon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3883-3887)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4738.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor