+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On August 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-388.
- Signed by President.
On August 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 1, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 28, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 26, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On June 8, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 1, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor