+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 24, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-520.
- Signed by President.
On October 13, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 6, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 4, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 418 - 1 .
On October 3, 1988 in the House:
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
On September 30, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 604.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-1025.
On September 29, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 22, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 3, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On June 1, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor