+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 19, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-214.
On October 14, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 21, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 20, 2022 in the Senate:
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 453.
On July 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4547-4550)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4693.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 44 (Roll no. 137).
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4560)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 44 (Roll no. 137).
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On July 26, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (103)
Type:
Primary Sponsor