+ − Actions (6)
On November 20, 1981 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From U.S. Trade Representative.
On October 23, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From St. Lawrence Seaway Dev Corp.
On October 19, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On October 8, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Army, Atty General, Commerce, DOT, Interior, Justice, U.S. Trade Rep, USDA, St. Lawrence Seaway Devel Corp.
On October 5, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor