+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 13, 2010 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4686 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 301.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-528 .
On June 16, 2010 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Gregorio Kilili Camacho Sablan
Type:
Primary Sponsor