+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 14, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 527.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-642.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
On October 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor