+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-238.
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221)
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 14, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4357)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4672.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4357-4358)
- Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor