+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On December 19, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 107-368.
On December 9, 2002 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 15, 2002 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Armey asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendments.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4958 Amendment SA 4958 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Kennedy. To provide a complete substitute.
- S.AMDT.4959 Amendment SA 4959 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Kennedy. To amend the title.
- S.AMDT.4958 Amendment SA 4958 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4959 Amendment SA 4959 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
On June 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On June 5, 2002 in the House:
- DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with debate on the Rivers amendment under the five-minute rule.
- Rule H. Res. 432 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 432 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4664 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Science now printed in the bill. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 432 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Johnny Isakson to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 4664 .
- H.AMDT.500 Amendment offered by Ms. Rivers. An amendment to add a new section providing that the Director shall not exclude part-time students from eligibility for scholarships under the CSEMS program.
- H.AMDT.501 On agreeing to the Woolsey amendment Failed by recorded vote: 165 - 259 .
- H.AMDT.500 On agreeing to the Rivers amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- H.AMDT.501 Amendment offered by Ms. Woolsey. Amendment sought to establish the Biosafety Research Program by authorizing $35 million for support of fundamental research in areas related to assessing biosafety.
- DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with debate on the Woolsey amendment under the five-minute rule.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 4664 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 397 - 25 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 4, 2002 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 107-488 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 291.
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 432 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4664 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Science now printed in the bill. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments.
On May 22, 2002 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 9, 2002 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 8, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research.
On May 7, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
+ − Amendments (4)
H.AMDT.500
An amendment to add a new section providing that the Director shall not exclude part-time students from eligibility for scholarships under the CSEMS program.
H.AMDT.501
Amendment sought to establish the Biosafety Research Program by authorizing $35 million for support of fundamental research in areas related to assessing biosafety.
S.AMDT.4958
To provide a complete substitute.
S.AMDT.4959
To amend the title.
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2002: On Agreeing to the Amendment
- Yeas: 165
- Nays: 259
- Absent: 10
June 5, 2002: On Passage
- Yeas: 397
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor