+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 18, 1988 in the House:
- Provisions of Measure Incorporated Into H.R.3545 .
On August 10, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Treasury.
On August 3, 1988 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 100-814 .
On June 21, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation Discharged.
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From DOT.
On June 15, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 3, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation.
- Executive Comment Requested from Navy, Treasury, DOT.
On May 24, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor