+ − Actions (7)
On September 23, 1982 in the House:
- For Further Action See S.187 .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 2, 1982 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On August 17, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 9, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On October 5, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks.
On October 1, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor