+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 28, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 350.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 109-609 .
On June 28, 2006 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
On April 7, 2006 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On December 23, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor