+ − Actions (10)
On July 27, 1982 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.6867 .
On June 22, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 7, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
On May 26, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 17, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 18, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From US Intl Trade Comm.
On October 7, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, Interior, US Trade Rep, US Intl Trade Comm.
On October 2, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On September 30, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor