+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 19, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-546.
- Signed by President.
On December 8, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 7, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. McCollum asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4359 Amendment SA 4359 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4359 Amendment SA 4359 proposed by Senator Grassley for Senator Leahy. To express the sense of Congress regarding the obligation of grantee States to ensure access to postconviction DNA testing and competent counsel in capital cases.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On October 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 2, 2000 in the House:
- Mr. Canady moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4640 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 26, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 544.
- Committee on Armed Services discharged.
- House Committee on Armed Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 26, 2000.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-900 , Part I.
On July 26, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 15, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 13, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On June 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4359
To express the sense of Congress regarding the obligation of grantee States to ensure access to postconviction DNA testing and competent counsel in capital cases.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor