+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 30, 2004 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-398.
- Signed by President.
On October 19, 2004 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 12, 2004 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 10, 2004 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 13, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4632 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Turner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On July 21, 2004 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor