+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 113-157.
On August 4, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5312)
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5688-5693)
- Mr. Pitts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4631.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5688-5690)
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 365.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-490.
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (87)
Type:
Primary Sponsor