+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-155.
- Signed by President.
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 416 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4621 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor