+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 2, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Agricultural Production.
On May 24, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On May 23, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 18, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Cotton, Rice, and Sugar Discharged.
On May 17, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Cotton, Rice, and Sugar.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor