+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 10, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 569.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-1002.
On August 1, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 28, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 4, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 16, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Justice.
On January 30, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Commerce.
On January 27, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On January 23, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor