+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 14, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-470.
- Signed by President.
On October 2, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 29, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 29, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 10, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Discharged from Subcommittee on Administrative Practice and Procedure.
On June 2, 1986 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure.
On May 21, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On May 19, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 15, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 352.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 99-603.
On May 6, 1986 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 15, 1986 in the House:
- For Previous Action See H.R.2153 .
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor