+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 8, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-670 .
On July 21, 2004 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 9.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 8, 2004 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 11 - 5.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 17, 2004 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property.
On June 16, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor