+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1008-1009)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4583.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1008-1010)
- Mr. Whitfield moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House