+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 13, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-301.
On October 5, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 4, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 3, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 910.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 106-463 .
On September 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 11, 2000 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4579 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
On June 22, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 13, 2000 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 7, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On June 6, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor