+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-611.
- Signed by President.
On October 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 20, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
On October 19, 1988 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3740 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Glenn. To amend title 5, United States Code, with respect to the expiration date of certain programs under which awards may be made to Federal employees for superior accomplishments or cost savings disclosures, and for other purposes.
- S.AMDT.3740 Amendment SP 3740 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 2, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On July 26, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On June 29, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 23, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Civil Service.
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
On May 11, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3740
To amend title 5, United States Code, with respect to the expiration date of certain programs under which awards may be made to Federal employees for superior accomplishments or cost savings disclosures, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor