+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 19, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 20, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 14, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 13, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 7, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 1, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 30, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 29, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 16, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
On April 10, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor