+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 30, 2004 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-395.
- Signed by President.
On October 19, 2004 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 12, 2004 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 10, 2004 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4556 .
- Mrs. Miller moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 380 - 0, 1 Present .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 21, 2004 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor