+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On August 18, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic and Commercial Law.
On June 27, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On June 22, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
On June 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 9, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor