+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 23, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 963.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Stafford without amendment. Without written report.
On September 16, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On August 5, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On August 4, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On July 16, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on Consent Calendar No: 26.
- Placed on House Calendar No: 167.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 99-681.
On June 25, 1986 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds Discharged.
On April 24, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
On April 10, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor