+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1667)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4549.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1667-1670)
- Mr. Hurd (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-493.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor