+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 13, 2010 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-527 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300.
- Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4514 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 350 - 26 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 16, 2010 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor