+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On June 28, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From State.
On February 16, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Labor.
On December 20, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from CIA.
On December 6, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from HHS, State, Justice.
On December 5, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
On November 18, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor