+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On November 29, 1990 in the House:
- See S.358 .
On June 27, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 14, 1990 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from HHS, Justice, State.
On April 23, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On April 12, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
On April 4, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor