+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 10, 1998 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-359.
- Signed by President.
On November 2, 1998 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 20, 1998 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 14, 1998 in the House:
- Mr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Miller objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On August 27, 1998 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry, Resource Conservation and Research.
On August 13, 1998 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior.
On August 6, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor