+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On September 13, 1990 in the House:
- See H.R.5295 .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 27, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 26, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 24, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 3, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 13, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On April 4, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor