+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2615 Amendment SP 2615 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 2615 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2615 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Rockefeller. To amend the National Aeronautics and Space Act of 1958, and for other purposes.
- Amendment SP 2615 proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Rockefeller.
- Measure laid before Senate.
On September 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 674.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
On September 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On August 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On August 8, 1994 in the House:
- Mr. Brown moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On August 3, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 354.
- Reported by the Committee on Science, Space and Technology. H. Rept. 103-654.
On July 20, 1994 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On July 13, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 12, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 2, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Environment and Aviation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
On May 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2615
To amend the National Aeronautics and Space Act of 1958, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor