+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On October 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 3, 1994 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Applegate moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 30, 1994 in the House:
- Mr. Laughlin asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Public Works + Transportation have until 6:00 p.m. on Sept. 30 to file a report on H.R. 4460 . Agreed to without objection.
- Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 103-770.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 418.
On September 28, 1994 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
On July 26, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 19, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 3, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On May 19, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor